+ − Actions (21)
On June 12, 2002 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 28, 2002 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 28, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Bill Typed as Truly Agreed
On May 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 30 NAYS: 0
On April 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
- Executive Session Held
On April 10, 2002 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Transportation
On April 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 5, 2002 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 137 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 1
On April 2, 2002 in the House:
- Reported Perfected and Printed
- Perfected by Consent
On March 14, 2002 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On March 13, 2002 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 7, 2002 in the House:
- Referred: Criminal Law
On February 28, 2002 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 27, 2002 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor