+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Utilities
On January 9, 2020 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor