+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Taken Up
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 136 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Taken Up
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Referred: Select Committee on Insurance
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Health Insurance
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (2)
5528H03.01H
Distributed
5528H03.04H
Distributed