+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 2, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time