+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Friday, May 11, 2018, 9:00am, Bingham Conference Room
- Referred: Senate Fiscal Oversight
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS voted do pass
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Monday, April 9, 2018, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 144 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 to HA 1, HA 1 as amended, HSA 1 for HA 2 adopted
- Laid Over - HA 1 to HA 1, HA 1 as amended adopted/HA 2/HCS as amended pending
- Taken Up
- HCS Adopted
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (5)
4083H03.13H
Distributed
4083H03.10H
Adopted
4083H03.04H
Adopted
4083H03.03H
Adopted
4083H03.02H
Substitute