+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Rules - Returned to the Committee of Origin
- Rules - Voted to Return to Committee of Origin
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Financial Institutions
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time