+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Continued
- Action Postponed
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 15 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Referred: Select Committee on General Laws
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time