+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (54)
On June 30, 2008 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 29, 2008 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 29, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Submits Conference Committee Report
On May 7, 2008 in the House:
- House Adopts Conference Committee Substitute
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 86 NOES: 64
- House Adopts Conference Committee Report - AYES: 87 NOES: 65
On May 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Substitute
- Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report - YEAS: 30 NAYS: 2
- Senate Adopts Conference Committee Substitute
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 30 NAYS: 2
On May 2, 2008 in the House:
- Conference Committee Substitute
- House Submits Conference Committee Report
On April 30, 2008 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 29, 2008 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On April 28, 2008 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On April 24, 2008 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On April 23, 2008 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On April 22, 2008 in the House:
- House Conference Committee Appointed - REPRESENTATIVES ICET, ROBB, STREAM. CURLS AND STORCH
On April 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed - SENATORS NODLER, MAYER, RUPP, BRAY AND GREEN
On April 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference
On April 21, 2008 in the House:
- House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- SCS Adopted
On April 17, 2008 in the House:
- Reported to the House
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 30 NAYS: 1
On April 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
- Public Hearing Held
On April 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held
On April 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - SEE SCHEDULE HCS HB 2001
On April 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Appropriations
On March 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 27, 2008 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 88 NOES: 60
On March 26, 2008 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 25, 2008 in the House:
- Laid Over
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Reported Do Pass with Time Limit - TEN HOURS TOTAL DEBATE ON PERFECTION HB 2001 THROUGH HB 2013
- Rules - Voted Do Pass with Time Limit
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 10, 2008 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Referred: Budget
- Read Second Time
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor