+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On June 17, 2010 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 25, 2010 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On April 29, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On April 28, 2010 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 115 NOES: 42
- House Concurs - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 111 NOES: 46
- Conference Committee Was Dissolved
On April 26, 2010 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 22, 2010 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On April 20, 2010 in the House:
- House Conference Committee Appointed - REPRESENTATIVES ICET, STREAM, SILVEY, LAMPE AND KELLY
On April 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed - SENATORS MAYER, SCHAEFER, RUPP, BRAY AND GREEN
- Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference
On April 19, 2010 in the House:
- House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference - SCS
On April 14, 2010 in the House:
- Reported to the House with...
On April 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 27 NAYS: 0
- SCS Adopted
On April 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
- Public Hearing Held
On March 31, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled
On March 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Appropriations
On March 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 25, 2010 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 149 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0
On March 24, 2010 in the House:
- Perfected - AYES: 150 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
- HCS Adopted
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 23, 2010 in the House:
- Laid Over
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 22, 2010 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass with Time Limit - EIGHT HOURS TOTAL DEBATE ON PERFECTION FOR HB 2001 THROUGH 2013
- Rules - Voted Do Pass with Time Limit
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 19, 2010 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 17, 2010 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On March 16, 2010 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Referred: Budget
- Read Second Time
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor