+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 2, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Vetoed by Governor
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Message
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 32
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - THURSDAY, MAY 1, 2014, 9:45AM, PERSHING GALLERY
- Public Hearing Held
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 30, 2014, 8:00am, Senate Committee Room 1
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 148 NOES: 2
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - not Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - not Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
- HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Financial Institutions
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (2)
6228H02.02H
Distributed
6228H02.03H
Withdrawn
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor