+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Action Postponed
- Executive Session Continued
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Career Readiness
On January 9, 2020 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Read First Time
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor