+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On May 12, 2006 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- SEE COMMENTS - MOTION TO 3RD READ AND PASS WITHDRAWN
On April 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
- Executive Session Held
- Public Hearing Held
On April 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - SENATE LOUNGE-WEDNESDAY, APRIL 12, 2006-12:00PM ORUPON NOON RECESS
On April 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Agriculture,Conservation,Parks & Nat Res
On April 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 3, 2006 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 130 NOES: 19 PRESENT: 2
On March 31, 2006 in the House:
- Pursuant to Rule 44 - HBs for Perfection Consent - This bill has remained on the HB for Perfection Consent Calendar for five legislative days withoutany objection, and any committee substitutes and committee amendments are hereby adopted by consent
On March 16, 2006 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
On March 14, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Tourism
- Read Second Time
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor