+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor