+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass
- Public Hearing Held
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Monday, April 23, 2018, 2:00pm, SCR 2
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 105 NOES: 38 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 3 adopted
- HCS#2 Adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS#2 Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- HCS#2 Voted Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to Committee of Origin - Conservation and Natural Resources AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1
- Voted to Return to the Committee of Origin
- Executive Session Completed
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Action Postponed
- Executive Session Continued
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (7)
5740H04.10H
Distributed
5740H04.08H
Distributed
5740H04.09H
Distributed
5740H04.05H
Defeated
5740H04.03H
Adopted
5740H04.01H
Adopted
5740H04.04H
Distributed
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor