+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - voted do pass
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, April 26, 2016, 12:00pm, Senate Lounge
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Taken Up
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 145 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Taken Up
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 adopted
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments Consent - HCA 1 AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Referred: Select Committee on Rules
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments - Consent
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Telecommunications
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read First Time
On January 5, 2016 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (2)
5523H01.04H
Adopted
5523H01.03H
Distributed
+ − Vote
April 18, 2016: HB 1972
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor