+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 1, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On April 26, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On April 25, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 11, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On March 23, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor