+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 8, 2011 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 154 NOES: 0
- House Concurs - SCA 1 ADOPTED AYES: 152 NOES: 0
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCA 1
On April 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SCA 1 ADOPTED YEAS: 34 NAYS: 0
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - SCA 1
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS W/SCA 1
- Public Hearing Held
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 19, 2011, 8:00AM, SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Health, Mental Health, Seniors, and Families
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 149 NOES: 1
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
- HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Health Care Policy
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 13, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor