+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Health Care Policy
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 13, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (55)
Type:
Primary Sponsor