+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On July 11, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 129 NOES: 22
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 138 NOES: 17
- House Concurs - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 139 NOES: 15
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- SCS Adopted
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 32
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 32
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SCS/SA 1/ AND POINT OF ORDER PENDING
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 17, 2013, 12:00PM OR UPON MORNING RECESS, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 140 NOES: 13
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Economic Development
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor