+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Government Oversight
On January 6, 2022 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 15, 2021 in the House:
- Prefiled