+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 1, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS#2 Reported Do Pass - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- HCS#2 Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Executive Session Completed
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Returned to Committee of Origin - Ways and Means AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted to Return to the Committee of Origin
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Ways and Means
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Read First Time
On January 6, 2020 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor