+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (58)
On July 13, 2006 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 26, 2006 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 1
- Senate Adopts Conference Committee Substitute
- Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 1
- Conference Committee Substitute
- Senate Submits Conference Committee Report
On May 5, 2006 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 144 NOES: 3
- House Adopts Conference Committee Substitute
- House Adopts Conference Committee Report - AYES: 149 NOES: 4
On May 4, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference
On May 4, 2006 in the House:
- House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
- House Submits Conference Committee Report
On May 4, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed - SENATORS KOSTER, GIBBONS, SHIELDS, COLEMAN AND KENNEDY
On May 4, 2006 in the House:
- House Conference Committee Appointed - REPRESENTATIVES HOBBS, RICHARD, PRATT, JOHNSONAND HENKE
- Conference Committee Substitute
On May 3, 2006 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS AS AMENDED
On May 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1 TO SSA 1 FOR SA 1, SSA 1 FOR SA 1 AS AMENDED SA 2, SA 5, SA 6, SA 7, SA 8, SA 9, SA 10 ADOPTED YEAS: 31 NAYS: 1
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On May 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 TO SSA 1 FOR SA 1, SSA 1 FOR SA 1 AS AMENDED ADOPTED/SCS, SS/SCS AS AMENDED PENDING
- SS Adopted - SA 2, SA 5, SA 6, SA 7 ADOPTED
- SS Adopted
- Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight
- Motion to Reconsider Adopted - VOTE TO ADOPT SS SCS RECONSIDERED, SA 8, SA 9, SA 10 ADOPTED
On April 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On April 25, 2006 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - SENATE LOUNGE-TUESDAY, APRIL 25, 2006-12:00PM
On April 18, 2006 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Pensions, Veteran Affairs & General Law
On April 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 13, 2006 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 154 NOES: 4
On April 12, 2006 in the House:
- Laid Over - HA 1, HSA 1 FOR HA 1, HA 1 TO HSA 1 FOR HA 1 AND HCS PENDING
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 TO HSA 1FOR HA 1,HSA 1 FOR HA 1,HSA 1 FOR HA 2,HA 1 TO HSA 1 FOR HA 2, HA 2 TO HSA 1 FOR HA 2, HA 1 TO HSA 1 FOR HA 3,HSA 1 FOR HA 3,HA 4, HA 5, HA1TOHA8,HA8A.A.HSA1FORHA1113ADOPTED-AYES150-NOES7
- HCS Adopted
On April 11, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
- Taken Up for Perfection
On April 6, 2006 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass with Time Limit - FIVE HOURS
- Rules - Voted Do Pass with Time Limit - FIVE HOUR FOR PERFECTION
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On April 3, 2006 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On March 28, 2006 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 14, 2006 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On March 6, 2006 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 2, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (70)
Type:
Primary Sponsor