+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, May 4, 2016, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Education
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 109 NOES: 47 PRESENT: 0
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - HPA 1 adopted AYES: 118 NOES: 38 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2, and HA 3 adopted
- HCS Adopted
- Taken Up
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Laid Over
- Taken Up
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Education
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 2 AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to Committee of Origin
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Voted to Return to the Committee of Origin
- Executive Session Completed
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 1 TO HCA 1, HCA 2 TO HCA 1 AND HCA 1 AS AMENDED AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Referred: Select Committee on Education
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Emerging Issues in Education
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 30, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (16)
4761H03.15H
Distributed
4761H03.14H
Distributed
4761H03.12H
Distributed
4761H03.10H
Distributed
4761H03.09H
Distributed
4761H03.13H
Distributed
4761H03.08H
Distributed
4761H03.07H
Distributed
4761H03.06H
Distributed
4761H03.03H
Distributed
4761H03.02H
Distributed
4761H03.01H
Distributed
4761H01.11H
Distributed
4761H01.08H
Distributed
4761H01.09H
Distributed
4761H01.07H
Distributed