+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (2)
6172L02.01H
Distributed
6172L02.02H
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor