+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 6, 2006 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 16, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Small Business
On March 6, 2006 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 2, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time