+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held - SCS voted do pass
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Thursday, April 14, 2016, 8:30am, Senate Lounge
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Veterans' Affairs and Health
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 154 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 133 NOES: 23 PRESENT: 0
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Taken Up
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2 adopted
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 1 AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Referred: Select Committee on Social Services
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 21, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled