+ − Actions (12)
On April 10, 2002 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Second Read/Referred: Insurance & Housing
On April 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 5, 2002 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 148 NOES: 0
On April 2, 2002 in the House:
- Reported Perfected and Printed
- Perfected by Consent
On March 14, 2002 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On March 12, 2002 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 28, 2002 in the House:
- Referred: Insurance
On February 13, 2002 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 12, 2002 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor