+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 97 NOES: 48
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Elections
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendment
6114H04.01H
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor