+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Message
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - HCS,
- Taken Up
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
- Public Hearing Held
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, May 7, 2019, 7:00pm or evening recess whichever is later, SCR 2
- Second read and referred: Appropriations
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Taken Up
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 141 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4 adopted
- HCS Adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 30 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Budget
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (11)
0019H02.30H
Adopted
0019H02.29H
Adopted
0019H02.28H
Adopted
0019H02.27H
Distributed
0019H02.24H
Distributed
0019H02.23H
Distributed
0019H02.19H
Adopted
0019H02.18H
Distributed
0019H02.17H
Defeated
0019H02.12H
Distributed
0019H02.11H
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor