+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, March 28, 2018, 8:00am, Senate Lounge
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Seniors, Families, and Children
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 138 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 1
- Taken Up
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up for Perfection
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy
On January 4, 2018 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time