+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time