+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Small Business, Insurance, and Industry
On April 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 23, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 113 NOES: 040
On April 19, 2012 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2 ADOPTED
- HCS Adopted
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Health Insurance
- Read Second Time
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor