+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Special Standing Committee on Disability Services
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor