+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 20, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Message
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 32
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, April 29, 2014, 9:00am, Senate Committee Room 1
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Seniors, Families, and Pensions
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 150 NOES: 1
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
- Taken Up for Perfection
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Retirement
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor