+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On June 19, 2008 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 29, 2008 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 29, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 34 NAYS: 0
On April 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
- Public Hearing Held
On April 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 15, 2008, 2:00PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Agriculture,Conservation,Parks & Nat Res
On April 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 141 NOES: 0
On March 26, 2008 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules - This bill has remained on the HB for Perfection Consent Calendar for five legislative days withoutany objection, and any committee substitutes and committee amendments are hereby adopted by consent
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources
On January 29, 2008 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 28, 2008 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor