+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (64)
On June 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 30, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Message
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 28 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
- Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report - AYES: 28 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
- Senate Submits Conference Committee Report
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- House Message
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 140 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
- House Adopts Conference Committee Report - AYES: 140 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
- House Submits Conference Committee Report
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
- House Distributes Conference Committee Report
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Message
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed - SENATORS CUNNINGHAM, WIELAND, CRAWFORD, SIFTON, WALSH
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- House Message
- House Conference Committee Appointed - REPRESENTATIVES FRAKER, HOUX, SHAUL(113), NICHOLS, ROWLAND(29)
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Message
- Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- House Message
- House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference - SS as amended
- Taken Up
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Taken Up
- SS Adopted
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS as amended
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4 adopted AYES: 30 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Senate Message
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
- Taken Up
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 to SS for SCS pending
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Taken Up
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS voted do pass
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, February 27, 2018, 8:05am, Senate Lounge
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Insurance and Banking
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Taken Up
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 144 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up for Perfection
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Financial Institutions
On January 4, 2018 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (9)
5493H.09S
Passed
5493H09.1HR
Adopted
5493S07.02S
Adopted
5493S07.04S
Adopted
5493S07.05S
Adopted
5493S.07F
Adopted, as amended
5493S07.01S
Adopted
5493H09.02F
Distributed
5493S07.01F
Distributed