+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 2, SA 3, SA 4, SA 5, SA 6, SA 8 ADOPTED/ SCS AS AMENDED, SA 9 PENDING
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Removed from Consent Calendar
On April 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar
On April 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
- Public Hearing Held
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 9, 2008, 2:00PM, SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1
On April 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Education
On April 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 141 NOES: 5
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules - This bill has remained on the HB for Perfection Consent Calendar for five legislative days withoutany objection, and any committee substitutes and committee amendments are hereby adopted by consent
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education
On January 29, 2008 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 28, 2008 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor