+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Education
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 16, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor