+ − Actions (22)
On May 13, 2002 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On April 24, 2002 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- Second Read/Referred: Pensions and General Laws
On April 18, 2002 in the House:
- SEE COMMENTS - LETTER OF OBJECTION FILED
On April 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 17, 2002 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 90 NOES: 61 PRESENT: 3
- Motion to Reconsider Adopted - VOTE BY WHICH LEGISLATION WAS THIRD READ AND DEFEATED AYES: 105 NOES: 45
On April 11, 2002 in the House:
- Motion to Postpone Adopted - MOTION TO RECONSIDER VOTE BY WHICH BILL WAS DEFEATED POSTPONED UNTIL WEDNESDAY, APRIL 17, 2002. AYES: 90 NOES: 45
- Third Read and Defeated - AYES: 70 NOES: 79 PRESENT: 1
On April 10, 2002 in the House:
- Reported Perfected and Printed
On April 9, 2002 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 2 PART 2, HA 3, HA 5, HA 6, HA 1 TO HA 7, HA 7 AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 77 NOES: 75 PRESENT: 3
- Taken Up for Perfection
On April 8, 2002 in the House:
- Laid Over - PART 2 OF HA 2, HA 3 ADOPTED/HA 4 PENDING
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
On March 5, 2002 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
On February 27, 2002 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 21, 2002 in the House:
- Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing
On February 12, 2002 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 11, 2002 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor