+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - SCA 1
On May 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On May 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - MONDAY, MAY 7, 3:30PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On May 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections
On April 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 26, 2012 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Defeated - AYES: 088 NOES: 053
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 106 NOES: 037
On April 25, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2 ADOPTED
- HCS Adopted
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Elections
- Read Second Time
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor