+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (56)
On June 30, 2010 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 25, 2010 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 25, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 14, 2010 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Defeated - AYES: 71 NOES: 79
- House Adopts Conference Committee Report - AYES: 125 NOES: 31
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 124 NOES: 29
- House Adopts Conference Committee Substitute
On May 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Submits Conference Committee Report
- Conference Committee Substitute
- Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report - YEAS: 30 NAYS: 1
- Senate Adopts Conference Committee Substitute
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 30 NAYS: 1
On May 13, 2010 in the House:
- Conference Committee Substitute
- House Submits Conference Committee Report
On May 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed - SENATORS SHIELDS, SCHAEFER, CROWELL, BRAY AND GREEN
On May 11, 2010 in the House:
- House Conference Committee Appointed - REPRESENTATIVES SCHARNHORST, BRUNS, HOSKINS, ROORDA AND WHITEHEAD
On May 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Conferees to Exceed Differences
- Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference
On May 11, 2010 in the House:
- Conferees to Exceed Differences
- House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
On May 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1 TO SA 1, SA 1 AS AMENDED, SA 2,SA 3, SA 5, SA 6, SA 7, SA 8, SA 9, SA 1 TO SA 10, SA 10 AS AMENDED, SA 12 ADOPTED YEAS: 31 NAYS: 1
- Emergency Clause Adopted - YEAS: 31 NAYS: 1
On May 6, 2010 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS AS AMENDED
On May 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - THURSDAY, MAY 6, 2010, 8:00A.M.,SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1
On May 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight
- SCS Adopted - SA 5, SA 6, SA 7, SA 8, SA 9, SA 1 TO SA 10, SA 10 AS AMENDED, SA 12 ADOPTED
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 TO SA 1, SA 1 AS AMENDED, SA 2, SA 3 ADOPTED/SCS, SA 4 PENDING
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On April 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - MONDAY, APRIL 26, 2010, 3:00P.M.SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 2
On April 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - MONDAY, APRIL 19, 2010, 1:00P.M.SENATE LOUNGE
On April 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On April 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections
On March 31, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 31, 2010 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 145 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On March 30, 2010 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules - This bill has remained on the HB for Perfection Consent Calendar for five legislative days withoutany objection, and any committee substitutes and committee amendments are hereby adopted by consent
On March 22, 2010 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 17, 2010 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On March 16, 2010 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- Referred: Special Standing Committee on General Laws
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 28, 2010 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor