+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 28 NAYS 3
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1, SA 3, SA 4 ADOPTED
- SS Adopted
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Placed on Informal Calendar
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On May 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SCS/SA 1 PENDING
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On May 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On May 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - THURSDAY, MAY 3, 8:00AM. SCR 1
On May 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Ways and Means
On April 26, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 095 NOES: 043
On April 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 25, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 1 TO HA 2, HA 2 AS AMENDED, HA 3, HA 5, HA 6 AS AMENDED
- HCS Adopted - AYES: 101 NOES: 051
- Taken Up for Perfection
On April 19, 2012 in the House:
- Laid Over
- Taken Up for Perfection
On April 5, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Refer: Spec Stand Com Government Oversight & Accountability
- Read Second Time
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (14)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor