+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 18, 2012 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS, SA 1, SA 2
On May 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Senate Substitute Offered
- SS Adopted
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1, SA 2 YEAS: 33 NAYS: 1
- Emergency Clause Adopted - YEAS: 31 NAYS: 3
On May 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight
- Public Hearing Scheduled - THURSDAY, MAY 17, 9:45AM, PERSHING CONFERENCE RM
On May 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On May 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, MAY 15, 12:00PM, SCR 1
On May 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Small Business, Insurance, and Industry
On May 7, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Reported Do Pass
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 115 NOES: 028
On May 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On May 2, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 5 ADOPTED
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 5, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Special Standing Committee on Disability Services
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (10)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor