+ − Actions (26)
On July 11, 2003 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 160 NOES: 0
- House Concurs - SCS AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 157 NOES: 2
- Reported to the House with... - SCS AS AMENDED
On May 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1 ADOPTED YEAS: 31 NAYS: 0
- SCS Adopted
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On May 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Second Read/Referred: Pensions and General Laws
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 160 NOES: 0
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 5, HA 6 ADOPTED
- HCS Adopted
On January 27, 2003 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On January 22, 2003 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 16, 2003 in the House:
- Referred: Children and Families
On January 15, 2003 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 14, 2003 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor