+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Placed Back on Perfection Calendar
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 6 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Government Efficiency
On January 4, 2018 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Read First Time
On January 2, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (6)
5613H01.08H
Distributed
5613H01.03H
Distributed
5613H01.05H
Distributed
5613H01.06H
Distributed
5613H01.02H
Distributed
5613H01.01H
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor