+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On January 4, 2018 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Read First Time
On January 2, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled