+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On July 11, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Defeated on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 92 NOES: 63
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 98 NOES: 59
- House Concurs - SS ADOPTED AYES: 98 NOES: 58
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held
- Reported Do Pass
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 32 NOES: 1
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 32 NOES: 1
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - THURSDAY, MAY 16, 2013, 9:30AM, SCR 1
- Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight
- SS Adopted
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Reported Do Pass
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 24, 2013, 12:00 p.m., or Upon Morning Recess, Senate Lounge
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 142 NOES: 10
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Bill Reconsidered
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Local Government
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time