+ − Actions (21)
On June 13, 2002 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 28, 2002 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 28, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Bill Typed as Truly Agreed
On May 2, 2002 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 30 NAYS: 0
On April 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
On April 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
- Public Hearing Held
On April 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Second Read/Referred: Commerce and Environment
On April 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 4, 2002 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 123 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 1
On March 20, 2002 in the House:
- Reported Perfected and Printed
- Perfected by Consent
On March 13, 2002 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On March 12, 2002 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 21, 2002 in the House:
- Referred: Motor Vehicle & Traffic Regulations
On February 11, 2002 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 7, 2002 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor