+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Tax Reform
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor