+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Action Postponed
- Executive Session Continued
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Elections
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 14, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor